Financial history MARGARET EARLE FOR THE POOR

Charity number: 223460
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £542 £846 £860 £868 £890
Total expenditure £0 £200 £0 £0 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A