THE HARROGATE DEAF SOCIETY

Charity number: 223555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019
Total gross income £41.79k £55.93k £14.27k £90.62k £16.12k
Total expenditure £39.72k £52.72k £11.28k £77.19k £8.65k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A