ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS CEREDIGION BRANCH

Charity number: 223675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £36.40k £76.88k £37.42k £44.83k £36.47k
Total expenditure £31.53k £36.13k £41.93k £49.71k £52.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A