ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS - CLWYD AND COLWYN BRANCH

Charity number: 223677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £196.11k £399.94k £151.12k £138.32k £103.11k
Total expenditure £200.34k £143.05k £131.45k £166.43k £240.85k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A