Financial history REVEREND MICHAEL SYDDALL'S CHARITY

Charity number: 223680
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £1.08k £241 £913 £931 £880
Total expenditure £1.20k £2.11k £303 £303 £820
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A