OLDHAM SOCIETY FOR THE DEAF

Charity number: 223729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.52k £19.35k £277.02k £281.67k £29.11k
Total expenditure £11.05k £25.64k £25.64k £39.72k £22.63k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A