RUGBY PHILHARMONIC CHOIR

Charity number: 223761
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £18.26k £13.11k £11.39k £11.51k £13.02k
Total expenditure £16.54k £8.45k £13.41k £9.31k £14.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A