THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF ST KATHARINE

Charity number: 223849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.69m £1.93m £2.03m £2.35m £2.41m
Total expenditure £2.20m £2.47m £2.27m £2.44m £2.49m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £648.00k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.18k £2.81k £4.82k £79.18k £6.56k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £755.10k £744.80k £705.65k
Income - Charitable activities £1.49m £1.70m £1.08m £1.26m £1.45m
Income - Endowments £1.18k £2.81k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £196.44k £174.16k £190.74k £258.94k £246.87k
Income - Other £0 £57.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £1.50k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.71m £1.91m £2.27m £2.44m £1.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.33k £11.99k £11.25k £13.05k £13.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £488.75k £557.43k £0 £0 £645.24k