THE ROYAL FOUNDATION OF ST KATHARINE

Charity number: 223849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN O'BRIEN Trustee 12 July 2021
THE WESTMINSTER ABBEY TRUST Received: On time
THE MICAH TRUST Received: On time
DAVID SWANNEY Trustee 17 December 2012 None on record
Diana Jane Banks Trustee 12 September 2018 None on record
ELIZABETH ANN MARSHALL Trustee
BOW ARTS TRUST Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY AND HOLY TRINITY, BOW (WITH BROMLEY SAINT LEONARD) Received: On time
Dr JOY PATRICIA HINSON PHD Trustee 24 September 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE'S, WEST HOLLOWAY, LONDON Received: On time
Sophia Louisa Densham LVO Trustee 22 March 2021 None on record
Rev Roger Martin Howell Preece Trustee 30 September 2019 None on record
The Rt Revd, Rt Hon Dame SARAH ELISABETH MULLALLY Trustee 08 March 2018
THE LONDON DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
THE LONDON DIOCESAN FUND Received: On time
BISHOP OF LONDON'S FUND Received: On time
The Hon Dame Annabel Alice Whitehead DCVO Trustee 21 March 2016 None on record
Andrew Peter Grigson Trustee 28 February 2014 None on record
GEOFFREY WILLIAM RICHARDS Trustee 12 December 2007
LSA CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
SIR STEPHEN MARK JEFFREY LAMPORT KCVO DL Trustee 07 July 2004 None on record