ALVESTON VILLAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 223913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £15.38k £16.70k £16.18k £17.49k £29.74k
Total expenditure £10.34k £14.28k £14.58k £13.28k £28.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £12.86k