Financial history WOODHEAD AND PENNYFEATHER CHARITY

Charity number: 223993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £872 £890 £908 £927 £945
Total expenditure £1.96k £1.25k £1.13k £890 £625
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A