LYNN WOOD APPEAL FUND

Charity number: 224059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £4.99k £5.70k £11.59k £5.40k £5.41k
Total expenditure £3.41k £3.65k £3.13k £5.77k £12.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A