Financial history ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID AND LINCOLN BRANCH

Charity number: 224482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £174.65k £261.37k £230.55k £174.81k £249.32k
Total expenditure £186.10k £256.45k £240.91k £165.34k £227.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £57.23k £41.12k