Trustees ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID AND LINCOLN BRANCH
Charity number: 224482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amy Farrell | Chair | 07 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Preston Keeling | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Milburn | Trustee | 13 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Debra Bradbury | Trustee | 05 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wilson | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Read | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Clegg | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
MISS Dawn Fritzsch | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lewis Harry | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Haydn Jones | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carla Jones | Trustee | 22 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Penny Kemp | Trustee | 19 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.