Trustees GRANTHAM ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 224721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RAYMOND WOOTTEN Chair
None on record
Peter Sandham TOWNSEND Trustee 10 April 2019
YOUTH TRUST (GRANTHAM)
Received: On time
Jan Burrows Trustee 22 June 2016
CHARITY OF CHARLES CLARKE FOR CHURCH PURPOSES
Received: On time
LANGWITH CHARITY FOR POOR WOMEN
Received: On time
DONAL CONTRIBUTION FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST WULFRAM, GRANTHAM
Received: On time
JAMES ANDREW GREGORY FCA Trustee 21 October 2015
CHARITY OF CHARLES CLARKE FOR CHURCH PURPOSES
Received: On time
LANGWITH CHARITY FOR POOR WOMEN
Received: On time
DONAL CONTRIBUTION FUND
Received: On time
DR FRIER'S CHILDREN'S HOLIDAY FUND
Received: On time
Graham Peter Cook Trustee 21 October 2015
None on record
Rev Stuart William Cradduck Trustee 08 May 2014
None on record
Dr David john Roper Trustee 22 January 2014
None on record
ANDRE RONALD FINNEY Trustee 24 December 2013
GRANTHAM SUNRISE ROTARY CHARITY TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID HUGH CLOSE Trustee
None on record