HISTORIC SOCIETY OF LANCASHIRE AND CHESHIRE

Charity number: 224825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £10.37k £8.61k £9.35k £3.10k £5.70k
Total expenditure £11.07k £19.33k £15.88k £6.22k £2.00k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A