HISTORIC SOCIETY OF LANCASHIRE AND CHESHIRE

Charity number: 224825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

20 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Christine Jane Verguson Trustee 17 March 2021 None on record
DR DIANA ELIZABETH ASCOTT PHD Trustee None on record
ROGER CHRISTIAN HULL MA MCILIP Trustee None on record
Dr SHERYLLYNNE HAGGERTY Trustee None on record
Dr Nicholas Foggo Trustee 17 March 2016 None on record
DR ARLINE MARGARET WILSON PHD Chair None on record
Dr Marc David Collinson Trustee 03 March 2019 None on record
DR FIONA POGSON Trustee
RECORD SOCIETY OF LANCASHIRE AND CHESHIRE Received: On time
James Robert Evans Trustee 13 March 2019 None on record
DR Fiona Louise EDMONDS Trustee 22 March 2017 None on record
DR JOHN GEOFFREY TIMMINS PHD Trustee None on record
Catherine Nunn Trustee 15 June 2012 None on record
LIZ STEWART Trustee 04 September 2011 None on record
Dr Andrew Hobbs Trustee 17 March 2016 None on record
BRIAN HIGGINS Trustee 21 March 2018
WALLASEY CIVIC SOCIETY Overdue by 782 days
Dr James Crossland Trustee 17 March 2021 None on record
PROFESSOR JOHN CHARLES BELCHEM Trustee
MERSEYSIDE BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST Received: On time
THE SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF LABOUR HISTORY Received: On time
DR NICK WHITE PHD Trustee None on record
DR JANET ELIZABETH HOLLINSHEAD JP PHD Trustee None on record
Dr Peter Shapely Trustee 17 March 2021
ST MARY'S COLLEGE TRUST Received: On time
THE CHETHAM SOCIETY FOR THE PUBLICATION OF REMAINS HISTORICAL AND LITERARY CONNECTED WITH THE PALATINE COUNTIES OF LANCASTER AND CHESTER Received: 97 days late