Financial history THE GARLTHORPE CHARITY

Charity number: 224927
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 23/04/2018 23/04/2019 23/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022
Total gross income £11.39k £10.09k £12.65k £23.87k £16.08k
Total expenditure £5.97k £7.48k £11.32k £12.23k £52.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A