Financial history MARY PEASE'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 225036
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £20.62k £20.09k £22.58k £26.94k £31.31k
Total expenditure £11.25k £16.35k £10.21k £11.53k £13.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A