FRANCES DARLINGTON CHARITY

Charity number: 225140
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.92k £20.02k £19.64k £22.04k £21.45k
Total expenditure £12.34k £11.20k £18.19k £8.75k £9.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A