Financial history WILLIAM BANKES CHARITY

Charity number: 225147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/04/2017 25/04/2018 25/04/2019 25/04/2020 25/04/2021
Total gross income £100 £101 £102 £48 £201
Total expenditure £0 £0 £1.10k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A