THE PENSFORD SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 225346
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HUGO RUDOLPH PIKE Trustee 21 January 2021
Water Survival Box Ltd Received: On time
Janet Mary Ogilvie Trustee 21 January 2021 None on record
CHRISTINE MARGARET JONES Trustee 29 January 2014 None on record
Richard Martin PORTER Trustee 12 September 1996 None on record
BERNARD GLOVER COOMBS Trustee 24 August 1994 None on record
Elizabeth Ann Richardson Trustee 21 January 2021
CHEW VALLEY LAKE RECREATIONAL TRAIL Received: On time
THE PENSFORD, PUBLOW AND THE STANTONS COMMUNITY TRUST Received: On time
Kevin Edwin England Trustee 26 January 1993 None on record
JENNIFER ELIZABETH ANNE GULLY Chair 17 February 2000 None on record