Financial history WILLIAM WALTER FELLOWSHIPS

Charity number: 225432
Charity reporting is overdue by 285 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 16/07/2017 16/07/2018 16/07/2019 16/07/2020 16/07/2021
Total gross income £7.86k £8.37k £9.18k £9.41k £8.64k
Total expenditure £2.03k £14.24k £1.98k £1.87k £1.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A