ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS SHEFFIELD BRANCH

Charity number: 225570
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.50m £964.64k £736.22k £1.05m £1.19m
Total expenditure £1.08m £1.10m £1.22m £1.16m £808.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £19.20k N/A £176.17k
Income - Donations and legacies £872.39k £395.46k £146.75k £475.61k £859.55k
Income - Other trading activities £440.69k £381.97k £373.91k £368.58k £197.66k
Income - Charitable activities £167.19k £166.18k £192.34k £188.69k £106.81k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.04k £3.65k £3.74k £644 £42
Income - Other £19.79k £17.38k £19.49k £14.77k £23.59k
Income - Legacies £872.39k £284.17k £32.74k £332.65k £286.78k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £593.53k £766.90k £850.56k £858.20k £582.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds £347.04k £334.26k £371.42k £297.42k £225.21k
Expenditure - Governance £5.70k £0 £0 £0 £9.81k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £500 £570 £0 £429 £0
Expenditure - Other £140.45k £0 £0 £0 £0