GULWORTHY PARISH HALL

Charity number: 225764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 03 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 23 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required