GULWORTHY PARISH HALL

Charity number: 225764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.50k £13.94k £26.73k £20.29k £23.02k
Total expenditure £3.03k £2.82k £40.04k £13.22k £2.82k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.30k £14.98k £1.00k £21.00k