EGREMONT SOUP KITCHEN FUND

Charity number: 225886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/01/2017 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020 01/01/2021
Total gross income £1 £0 £6 £16 £23
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £500
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A