Financial history JABEZ AND SELAH BENNETT CHARITY

Charity number: 227141
Charity reporting is overdue by 76 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.13k £3.78k £1.89k £0 £3.78k
Total expenditure £1.34k £750 £500 £500 £500
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A