Financial history EDINBURGH TRUST NO2 ACCOUNT

Charity number: 227897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £125.55k £131.28k £104.23k £84.56k £181.34k
Total expenditure £128.33k £133.15k £150.74k £117.52k £95.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A