Financial history WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - MIDDLETON-ST-GEORGE

Charity number: 228315
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £7.19k £6.15k £5.34k £13.67k £2.68k
Total expenditure £7.75k £5.02k £6.43k £3.42k £7.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A