DURHAM COMMUNITY ACTION LIMITED

Charity number: 229119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £781.63k £650.75k £619.11k £605.95k £616.70k
Total expenditure £912.70k £658.20k £762.93k £602.69k £617.51k
Income from government contracts £292.98k £142.68k £195.15k £24.28k N/A
Income from government grants £410.90k £371.60k £145.72k £353.35k £222.59k
Income - Donations and legacies £20 £66 £95 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £20.60k £17.40k £26.72k £15.72k £34.88k
Income - Charitable activities £757.89k £631.14k £591.47k £588.37k £579.92k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.12k £2.15k £828 £1.86k £1.90k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £667.59k £658.20k £762.93k £602.69k £617.51k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.14k £12.32k £21.69k £8.08k £11.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £27.50k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £245.12k £0 £0 £0 £0