DURHAM COMMUNITY ACTION LIMITED

Charity number: 229119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JANICE MARGARET WORTERS Chair
ST CUTHBERTS CHURCH HALL, BENFIELDSIDE Received: On time
Angela Hawkes Trustee 23 September 2021 None on record
Linda Catherine Bird Trustee 26 November 2020
THE ABBEYFIELD BARNARD CASTLE SOCIETY LIMITED Received: 12 days late
THE FRIENDS OF THE BOWES MUSEUM Received: On time
CLARICE ANNIE SMITH Trustee 29 October 2011 None on record
Professor John Frederick Robinson Trustee 23 September 2021 None on record
JOHN ROBINSON Trustee
SEDGEFIELD CIVIC TRUST Received: On time
COUNTY OF DURHAM SCHOOL BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
SEDGEFIELD ARTS RECREATION AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time
TRIMDON STATION RECREATION GROUND Overdue by 629 days
JENNIFER FLYNN MBE LLB DL Trustee
TOW LAW COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time
Elaine Kilgannon MBE Trustee 23 September 2021 None on record
PROFESSOR SARAH JANE BANKS Trustee None on record
MICHAEL JOHN LITCHFIELD Trustee 16 July 2020
THE UNITED CHURCH SCHOOLS TRUST Received: On time
THE MOLITOR CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
PATRICIA BUCKLEY-ATKINS Trustee 11 September 2018
SEDGEFIELD ARTS RECREATION AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time