NICOLAS STACEY SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 229217
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £4.53k £4.58k £5.60k £4.99k £7.20k
Total expenditure £14.82k £6.98k £8.57k £2.76k £12.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A