Financial history THE TYNE MARINERS' BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION

Charity number: 229236
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £259.53k £246.31k £239.90k £251.65k £312.77k
Total expenditure £213.51k £222.09k £224.28k £204.97k £196.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A