Trustees INTERNATIONAL PLANNED PARENTHOOD FEDERATION
Charity number: 229476
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Gilmore | Chair | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Mwebesa | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jon Karleiv Andreas Lomoy | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayathe Ayeva | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Rose-Marie Antoine | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sami Natsheh | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Aurelia Nguyen | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosa Ayong Tchonang | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ulukbek Batyrgaliev | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Schaffer | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Isaac Adewole | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Surakshya Giri | Trustee | 17 May 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.