Accounts and annual returns WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - GREAT ECCLESTON

Charity number: 230241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 22 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 19 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 06 January 2020 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required