Financial history THE ROYAL LIVERPOOL PHILHARMONIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 230538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £11.57m £11.58m £10.22m £8.49m £10.26m
Total expenditure £11.98m £12.22m £11.62m £7.97m £10.61m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.53m N/A £1.11m N/A £1.55m
Income - Donations and legacies £4.51m £1.20m £4.24m £4.76m £5.39m
Income - Other trading activities £2.97m £3.06m £2.36m £205.00k £1.44m
Income - Charitable activities £4.08m £3.97m £3.50m £900.00k £2.71m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £13.00k £4.00k £12.00k £31.00k
Income - Other £10.00k £3.34m £111.00k £2.61m £681.00k
Income - Legacies £229.00k £425.00k £132.00k £0 £101.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.12m £9.22m £9.03m £6.33m £8.63m
Expenditure - Raising funds £329.00k £3.00m £2.59m £1.64m £1.98m
Expenditure - Governance £125.00k £132.00k £0 £0 £80.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £195.00k £0 £0 £155.00k
Expenditure - Other £2.53m £0 £0 £0 £0