Financial history GARDEMAU CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 230602
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £22.90k £24.76k £26.88k £27.20k £27.70k
Total expenditure £14.24k £37.88k £18.77k £17.60k £24.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.65k N/A