Financial history WORKING MEN'S READING ROOM

Charity number: 230755
Charity reporting is overdue by 301 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 13/06/2016 13/06/2017 13/06/2018 13/06/2019 13/06/2020
Total gross income £43.96k £41.55k £42.46k £42.31k £46.44k
Total expenditure £41.20k £37.06k £37.51k £41.85k £40.74k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.08k