WINWICK OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 230874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £836 £706 £692 £155 £425
Total expenditure £883 £799 £893 £1.30k £983
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A