STEWKLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 231141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.30k £25.88k £16.98k £16.32k £16.53k
Total expenditure £9.51k £31.46k £13.80k £17.02k £10.72k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.33k