STEWKLEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 231141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN FREDERICK KEMP Trustee
FENNY STRATFORD MISSION HALL Received: On time
ST MARTIN'S HOUSE Received: On time
MARGARET BURGESS Trustee 18 April 2013 None on record
ALAN DICKENS Trustee
POOR LAND CHARITY Received: On time
TOWN LANDS NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY Received: On time
JILLIAN SCOTT Trustee
POOR LAND CHARITY Received: On time
TOWN LANDS NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY Received: On time
SHEILA MARY FELLOWES Trustee None on record
Eileen Joyce Humphreys Trustee 10 July 2017 None on record
MARTIN WILLIAM SCRIVENER Trustee None on record
SUSAN NEALE Trustee 08 May 2017
POOR LAND CHARITY Received: On time
TOWN LANDS NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY Received: On time
Jennifer Ann Wodey Trustee 08 April 2019 None on record
JOHN MERVYN CORNISH Trustee None on record
JANET WESTON Trustee
POOR LAND CHARITY Received: On time
TOWN LANDS NON-ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY Received: On time
GILLIAN MARY WHEELER Trustee None on record
SALLY SHEFFERD Trustee 03 March 2016 None on record
STEPHEN PAUL KOHL ALEXANDER Chair None on record