Financial history THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - SWANSEA AND DISTRICT BRANCH

Charity number: 231615
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £3.54k £3.06k £5.19k £2.28k £444
Total expenditure £2.30k £2.32k £4.18k £1.07k £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A