THE J H LEVY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 231979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £3.90k £4.57k £8.61k £4.97k £5.14k
Total expenditure £4.00k £4.68k £8.33k £4.94k £4.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A