THE COCKENZIE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 232083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 19 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 14 December 2020 313 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 25 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 14 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 10 March 2017 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 10 March 2017 33 days late Download