THE COCKENZIE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 232083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £19.70k £16.97k £16.80k £15.19k £6.71k
Total expenditure £32.56k £34.72k £20.19k £24.56k £22.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A