THE ORDER OF FRIARS MINOR

Charity number: 232177
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.07m £6.98m £1.83m £1.17m £802.62k
Total expenditure £885.64k £3.73m £1.23m £1.01m £803.30k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £646.48k £6.47m £569.63k £581.55k £281.78k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £13.92k £13.76k £12.80k £11.61k £4.43k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £392.22k £391.67k £509.83k £564.46k £477.02k
Income - Other £17.26k £100.23k £739.90k £17.22k £39.39k
Income - Legacies £160.52k £194.57k £37.63k £189.61k £12.48k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £851.22k £3.68m £1.16m £940.06k £731.22k
Expenditure - Raising funds £34.42k £51.55k £68.23k £71.63k £72.08k
Expenditure - Governance £44.25k £67.79k £63.12k £91.09k £44.06k
Expenditure - Grants institution £273.99k £505.69k £571.37k £398.29k £282.80k
Expenditure - Investment management £34.42k £51.55k £68.23k £71.63k £72.08k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0