ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NORTHALLERTON THIRSK AND DALES BRANCH

Charity number: 232209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 25 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 August 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 07 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 08 July 2016 On time Download