Royal Society For The Prevention Of Cruelty To Animals York, Harrogate And District Branch

Charity number: 232222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 24 December 2019 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 24 December 2019 54 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 12 September 2017 On time Download