ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NEWCASTLE AND NORTH NORTHUMBERLAND BRANCH

Charity number: 232240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 14 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 14 September 2016 On time Download